KAINOS COMMUNITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND REHABILITATE AND PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF PRISONERS AND/OR EX-PRISONERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £161,945 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 1999: Standard registration
- 22 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1146304 LANGLEY HOUSE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £337.99k | £148.18k | £158.53k | £191.64k | £165.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £378.93k | £116.76k | £109.79k | £142.77k | £147.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £268.63k | £144.15k | £154.71k | £188.46k | £161.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND REHABILITATE AND PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF PRISONERS AND /OR EX-PRISONERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window