Trustees GURU GOBIND SINGH GURDWARA ( GGSG )
Charity number: 1078040
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURNAM SINGH SUCHA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gulchran Singh | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rai Singh Bahadur | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ASHISH PAL SINGH | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Gurcharan Singh | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kashmir Singh | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Balvindra Singh Momi | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Singh Dhindsa | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gurcharan Singh Kalirai | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kulvinder Singh Klair | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Parvinder Singh Rahi | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hardev Singh | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gurmukh Singh | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohinder Singh | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ranbir Singh Kali-Rai | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jasminder Kaur Sagoo | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GIAN SINGH SIDHU | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Singh Randhawa | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GURDIAL SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RANJIT SINGH SOHAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAMINDER SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GURMIT SINGH KALIRAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PARMJIT SINGH SOHAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARWAN SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KASHMIR SINGH BASRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALWANT SINGH GILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.