KEY TO THE DOOR PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Key To The Door work with the most hard to reach families across the boroughs of Oldham, Rochdale and Tameside in Greater Manchester. We provide training and workshop opportunities and encourage progression by offering appropriate learning environments suitable for the needs of young parents. Our motto is "If at first you don't succeed, try and try again!".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,920 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Tameside
Governance
- 22 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE LESLEY ASHWORTH | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Evans | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Daley | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE ROYALES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.00k | £135.27k | £102.85k | £9.11k | £12.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.36k | £103.81k | £105.97k | £72.76k | £28.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.44k | £6.14k | N/A | £4.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1999 AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 1999 FURTHER AMENDED 17 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OLDHAM (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO ARE IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR OF HOMELESS YOUNG PEOPLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION NATIONALITY, RACE, COLOUR, DISABILITY, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR HOUSING SUPPORT, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
OLDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadoak Community Centre
Broadoak Road
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Lancashire
Holly Suite
OL6 8RS
- Phone:
- 01613441121
- Email:
- keytothedoor@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window