Trustees OXFORDSHIRE PARENTING FORUM
Charity number: 1080678

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Eirwen Hills | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Dowe | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHY PETO | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Lesley Williams | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH TROUP | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tania-Jayne McCowliff | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.