THE ALDBOROUGH VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1083462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hire of village hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,696
Total expenditure: £4,236

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SEAN HYNES Chair 15 September 2013
BOROUGHBRIDGE SPORTS VILLAGE
Recently registered
Kathrin Dawn Ashley Trustee 05 January 2025
None on record
Susan Rigby Trustee 05 January 2025
None on record
Mark Learmonth Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Paul Pickburn Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Sarah Hall Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Bailey-Smith Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Sophie Charlotte Ann Steenberg Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Helen Jane Crosby-Hale Trustee 11 July 2017
None on record
Lady Julia Francesca Lawson-Tancred Trustee 12 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.90k £12.26k £4.22k £8.27k £8.70k
Total expenditure £6.67k £4.86k £3.70k £5.76k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Beeholme
Back Street
Aldborough
Boroughbridge
YORK
YO51 9EX
Phone:
01423324446
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available