EVESHAM AND DISTRICT MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evesham and District Mental Health Support Services work for a better life for everyone with experience of mental distress. Services available are: Counselling for both adults and children (11 to 17 years old), Dementia Meeting Centre, and advice and information from the Charity office.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 June 1999: Standard registration
- 01 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1201066 EVESHAM AND DISTRICT MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT SERVICE...
- EVESHAM AND PERSHORE MIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.91k | £83.89k | £152.05k | £70.73k | £79.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.94k | £71.49k | £88.76k | £95.40k | £95.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2007 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE RESIDENTS OF EVESHAM AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS BY: A. PROMOTING THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING B. PROVIDING SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL MENTAL DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
EVESHAM, PERSHORE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window