THE NIDDERDALE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote agricultural, horticultural and other kindred arts and interests
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 May 2000: Standard registration
- NIDDERDALE SHOW (Working name)
- PATELEY SHOW (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FORT | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH HARDCASTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANCIS DAVID SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR ALLAN STONEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.60k | £54.88k | £234.71k | £194.69k | £222.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.22k | £45.93k | £171.22k | £190.13k | £203.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 1926 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURE AND OTHER KINDRED ARTS AND INTERESTS (INCLUDING THE BREEDING AND REARING OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS OF ALL KINDS, AND THE PROVISION OF IMPLEMENTS, APPLIANCES, MANURE'S, FOODS, MEDICINES AND OTHER THINGS USED, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, IN CONNECTION WITH AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, OR THE BREEDING OR REARING OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS) BY ANY MEANS FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDERED DESIRABLE, AND IN PARTICULAR TO DO ALL OR ANY OF THE THINGS FOLLOWING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THEM, NAMELY, TO PROMOTE AND HOLD SHOWS, COMPETITIONS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND MEETINGS, TO GIVE PRIZES, CUPS, MEDALS, AWARDS AND DISTINCTIONS, TO MAKE EXPERIMENTS AND TESTS, AND ACQUIRE BY ANY OTHER MEANS, KNOWLEDGE IN CONNECTION WITH AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE AND OTHER KINDRED ARTS AND INTERESTS (INCLUDING AS AFORESAID), AND TO PREPARE AND ISSUE TEXT BOOKS, NEWSPAPERS, MAGAZINES, CIRCULARS, CATALOGUES AND REPORTS TO MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND OTHERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA HOUSE
WEST END
ASKRIGG
LEYBURN
DL8 3HN
- Phone:
- 01969650129
- Email:
- info@nidderdaleshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window