Financial history THE SIGMA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1085433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £22.19k £45.46k £32.98k £46.04k £7.21k
Total expenditure £52.32k £39.29k £22.74k £19.38k £41.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A