Financial history BRIDGE CHURCH HAYLING ISLAND

Charity number: 1085253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.54k £70.32k £45.44k £49.97k £60.58k
Total expenditure £46.73k £29.68k £42.14k £37.72k £42.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A