KU BIIR ( GET INVOLVED )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organised camps and activities to provide alternative lifestyles for young people. Introduced mentoring scheme to offer guidance to students including methods for studying for examinations and completion of projects.To brighten the future of youth in Croydon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Somalia
Governance
- 12 January 2000: Standard registration
- 20 June 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.44k | £4 | £4 | £8.99k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.25k | £4 | £4 | £8.99k | £9.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 04 December 2013 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 04 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 02 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 18 May 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH DECEMBER 1999, AS AMENDED 24TH JANUARY 2000 AND 12 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) AMONGST PERSONS FROM THE HORN OF AFRICAN COMMUNITY IN THE UK. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) OF SUCH PERSONS FROM THE ABOVE MENTIONED COMMUNITY. C. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE SAID COMMUNITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. D. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HORN OF AFRICAN HISTORY AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window