BOURNEMOUTH ALCOHOL AND DRUG SERVICE USER FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Telephone helpline, community support worker, advocacy service, annual news letter, annual open day. All to support people who are service users in the Bournemouth area who are looking to access or are currently in treatment services for drug and/or alcohol addiction. Charity shop (wef Jan 2013).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £8,000 from government contract(s) and £8,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 09 March 2000: Standard registration
- 11 June 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BADSUF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.01k | £109.95k | £97.82k | £96.41k | £76.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.23k | £116.72k | £100.26k | £94.38k | £84.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £86.50k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 15 February 2017 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
15 February 2017 | 15 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 02 February 2016 | 2 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING, THE ADVERSE HEALTH AND LIVING CONDITIONS OF THOSE WHOSE LIVES ARE AFFECTED BY SUBSTANCE MISUSE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION ON REHABILITATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BOURNEMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window