ST STEPHENS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of St Stephens Millennium Green.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 23 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN LANG WILSON | Chair | 08 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Smale Nash | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arwel Owen Lewis | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Rosemary Lorwerth Love | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Spooner | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Akbar | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Melbourne | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Claxton | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE BEADSMORE SMITH | Trustee | 08 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.56k | £10.40k | £15.31k | £15.07k | £18.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £10.27k | £8.75k | £10.98k | £13.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MAY 1999. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS ‘ST STEPHENS MILLENNIUM GREEN” TO THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR A MEETING AREA OR LACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE LOCALITY WHICH NOW READS IN SCHEDULE 2 "THE LOCALITY WHICH IS INTENDED TO BENEFIT FROM THE SUBJECT LAND INCLUDES PRIMARILY THE AREA WITHIN THE CITY OF BATH KNOWN AS LANSDOWN, CAMDEN, FAIRFIELD PARK AND ADJACENT AREAS AND ALSO GENERALLY THE CITY OF BATH."
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 RICHMOND HILL
BATH
BA1 5QT
- Phone:
- 01225315217
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window