Trustees ST STEPHENS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1076240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN LANG WILSON Chair 08 May 2011
None on record
Jonathan Smale Nash Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Arwel Owen Lewis Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Anne Rosemary Lorwerth Love Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Duncan Spooner Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Peter John Akbar Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
Christopher Robert Melbourne Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Claxton Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
CLAIRE BEADSMORE SMITH Trustee 08 May 2011
None on record