Financial history TANDRIDGE VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1075958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £103.21k £90.45k £114.48k £98.89k £111.45k
Total expenditure £83.90k £80.14k £101.41k £112.24k £121.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £77.81k £41.73k £73.89k £59.03k N/A