GUJARATI MITRA MANDAL (BEDFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Gujarati language classes and singing indian devotional songs and classical songs classes. Runs all indian cultural activities including Holi, Navratri, Rangoli, Diwali, Ram Navmi, Shivratri & Janmasthmi. Provides cultural facilities for Asian Men & Women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 11 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAHENDRAKUMAR KHUSHALBHAI MISTRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rashik Patel | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
NANDI PARSHOTTAM LATHIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TUSHARBABU KUMUDCHANDRA BHATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr LATA BHATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KALPANA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SURESH RATILAL MISTRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | £19 | £2 | £367 | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £547 | £307 | £719 | £2.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF GUJARATI ORIGIN AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES; 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION 2) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THOSE IN NEED OF IT 3) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 SPRINGFIELD AVENUE
KEMPSTON
BEDFORD
MK42 8JB
- Phone:
- 01234855696
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window