CHILDREN IN HUNGER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Releif of poverty in Brazil
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Enfield
- Brazil
Governance
- 30 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eamonn Gowing | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Barr | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Ephraim Thorpe | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA ROSIMEIRE ALVES DE SOUSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM TOWNSEND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.87k | £62.78k | £55.02k | £69.15k | £68.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.67k | £63.61k | £55.03k | £68.03k | £70.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MAY 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 1 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF CHILDREN IN BRAZIL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, MEDICAL CARE AND CLOTHING
Area of benefit
BRAZIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
204 Baker Street
Enfield
EN1 3JY
- Phone:
- 02082454069
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window