Financial history HORIZONS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1086929
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 21/03/2022 21/03/2023 21/03/2024
Total gross income £48.32k £31.91k £24.87k £10.93k £4.84k
Total expenditure £55.38k £26.23k £22.61k £19.66k £14.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A