THE FRIENDS OF THE WHEATSTONE DAY HOSPICE

Charity Number: 1077144
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005

Total income: £4,357
Total expenditure: £9,440

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 1999: Standard registration
  • 06 February 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005
Total gross income £5.52k £4.36k
Total expenditure £6.72k £9.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2005 06 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 19 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required