LYTCHETT MINSTER SPORTS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for recreation, sport and/or other leisure time occupation in or in connection with the area of Lytchett Minster and its neighborhood. It will continue to recruit and coach under supervision, adults and the youth of the area in the sporting skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 30 July 1999: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL CONCEPT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILL PIPE | Chair | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mead | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Pipe | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tony Yelland | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK HOBSON | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.81k | £10.57k | £8.44k | £15.63k | £11.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.76k | £8.97k | £10.73k | £12.69k | £11.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE AREA OF LYTCHETT MINSTER AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD. TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LYTCHETT MINSTER AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
LYTCHETT MINSTER AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Old Wareham Road
Beacon Hill
Poole
BH16 6AQ
- Phone:
- 07860 109009
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window