THE WESLEYAN COMMUNITY CARE (PROJECT) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charitity is to provide a variety of services to enhance the quality of life for older people with physical or mental disability and to provide extra support for people who are at risk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 26 September 2000: Standard registration
- 05 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.62k | £268.49k | £254.50k | £150.61k | £102.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.65k | £251.65k | £229.83k | £173.75k | £150.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 1999 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING IN WEST MIDLANDS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY AND PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE- TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, SEX, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY AND SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window