Financial history URAFIKI (LINKING WITH COMMUNITIES IN AFRICA)

Charity number: 1078505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £204.50k £246.49k £215.17k £208.28k £167.61k
Total expenditure £110.02k £310.13k £254.67k £200.04k £209.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A