THE TEW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A small family trust giving grants to mainly Christian organisations and individuals personally known to the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Burkina Faso
Governance
- 13 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ARNOLD TEW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MORAG JENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof DAVID PETER TEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOHN ARNOLD TEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESTHER SUSAN TEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARILYN WILSON TEW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.20k | £36.21k | £15.11k | £6.71k | £6.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.55k | £51.89k | £1.30k | £14.82k | £8.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JANUARY 1999.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAIMING OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHINGS OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE BY GRANTS TO CHURCHES, CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS, GROUPS OR INDIVIDUALS IN THE UK OR OVERSEAS. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING MONEY OR GRANTS DIRECTLY TO BENEFICIARIES OR BY SUPPORTING OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHICH EXIST TO PROVIDE HELP FOR SUCH PEOPLE. 3) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) SUPPORT FOR THE RELIEF OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY WHERE THERE IS NO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; THE RESETTLEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS AND DRUG ABUSERS; THE HOMELESS; AND THE PROVISION OF RELIEF FOR VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR CIVIL DISASTERS.
Area of benefit
UK OR OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
AILSA CRAIG
GREENS LANE
WROUGHTON
SWINDON
SN4 0RJ
- Phone:
- 01793814134
- Email:
- paultew@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window