EMPOWERMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, support and provide advocacy services as a means by which people disadvantaged by disability, age, or social exclusion can make known their needs and wishes in order to obtain appropriate services and so increase their quality of life. To educate health and social care service providers and the community in general as to the difficulties for disadvantage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 June 1992: Standard registration
- 23 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1155897 EMPOWERMENT CHARITY LANCASHIRE
- BLACKPOOL ADVOCACY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £680.32k | £761.24k | £1.05m | £1.36m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £652.43k | £775.98k | £1.03m | £1.32m | £313 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £368.61k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.33k | £7.70k | £6.95k | £28.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £1.04k | £919 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £676.07k | £752.50k | £1.04m | £1.33m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £917 | £0 | £595 | £986 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £600.07k | £727.37k | £973.28k | £1.26m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £52.35k | £47.67k | £57.51k | £60.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 05 June 2017 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 15 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 02 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 27 November 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 03/08/2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 23/01/2013
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND PROVIDE ADVOCACY SERVICES OR REPRESENTATION SERVICES AS A MEANS BY WHICH PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED BY DISABILITY, ILLNESS, AGE OR SOCIAL EXCLUSION CAN MAKE KNOWN THEIR NEEDS AND WISHES IN ORDER TO OBTAIN APPROPRIATE SERVICES AND SO INCREASE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE 2. TO EDUCATE HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICE PROVIDERS AND THE COMMUNITY IN GENERAL AS TO THE DIFFICULTIES DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO EXPRESS THEMSELVES. 3. TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY ANY INDIVIDUAL OR FAMILY WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 29 June 1992 : Standard registration
- 23 March 2017 : Removed
- 23 March 2017 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window