THE CONGLETON AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Congleton U3A operates in the Congleton (Cheshire) area to encourage and facilitate educational and other activities, primarily aimed at retired and semi-retired individuals. The objective is for individuals with skills or expertise to share these (on a voluntary basis) with other members. The wide range of skills includes languages, dancing, handicrafts, sports and multiple educational subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 22 June 1999: Standard registration
- CONGLETON U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Tanner | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Carins | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dunn | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Evans | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE SINCLAIR | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Leonard Taylor | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Sparks | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Broughton | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandie Boynton | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Davies | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Patricia Grigg | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.67k | £19.50k | £43.20k | £64.31k | £45.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.01k | £14.78k | £49.27k | £60.47k | £39.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 03/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 30 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
CONGLETON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Southlands Road
CONGLETON
Cheshire
CW12 3JY
- Phone:
- 01260273504
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window