Trustees THE CONGLETON AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1076203

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Tanner | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Carins | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dunn | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Evans | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE SINCLAIR | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Leonard Taylor | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Sparks | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Broughton | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandie Boynton | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Davies | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Patricia Grigg | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.