ALBASTON 2000 MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of and maintenance of a Millennium green at Albaston Gunnislake Cornwall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 June 1999: Standard registration
- ALBASTON 2000 (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JULIA MASSEY | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS HUNN | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVELLYAN JAMES JACKETT | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA CAROLINE JACKETT | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRENVILLE JAMES EDWARDS | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £497 | £113 | £108 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.40k | £825 | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 MARCH 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "ALBASTON 2000 MILLENNIUM GREEN" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
ALBASTON, CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSETT HOUSE
ALBASTON
GUNNISLAKE
PL18 9AL
- Phone:
- 01822832304
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window