Accounts and annual returns HOLDING OUT HOPE

Charity number: 1077667
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 02 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required