Hallelujah International Miracles Ministries

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is chiefly concerned with propagating the whole message of the Bible. In doing so it aims to support the spiritual, physical, emotional and social needs of the community as far as it is capable. The charity convenes conferences weekly home fellowships and sunday meetings to impart and share knowledge and thereby strengthen the community. All segments of the community are welcomed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 January 2001: Standard registration
- THE WORLDWIDE ENABELISM CENTRE UEC (Working name)
- KOSMOS PENTECOSTAL CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WHYTE OPIO | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
JULIUS OPOKA | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev RICHARD OKELLO ODOCH | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £2.09k | £3.20k | £4.05k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £2.09k | £3.20k | £4.04k | £1.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2022 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2022 | 542 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH MAY 1999, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION RESOLUTION DATED 29TH DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 12 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH LOCATIONS WHERE THE TRUST MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE OPERATING (D) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Davies
Close
9 Davies
Close
RM13 9LJ
- Phone:
- 01708502717
- Email:
- richardodoch@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window