DALTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a multi activity community centre. We house the local community Police team and Community library , Army Cadets, Dance Tazia and other groups including alternative educational lessons. . A Spiritualist church meet weekly, film and lunch clubs for the elderly use the centre regularly as well as children's parties. Community groups attend the centre for activities/training and meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverly Ann Louw | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||
BARRY JOSEPH CURLEY | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen John Nott | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN JOSEPH MCGILL | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||
WILHELMINA JOHANNA ROBINSON | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Maddox | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
David Edward Ward | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicholas Walter Perie | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
RAYMOND WILLOCK | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN MARGARET JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
BARRY JOHN DOUGHTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.91k | £64.41k | £67.97k | £54.64k | £44.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.17k | £42.61k | £53.61k | £38.56k | £43.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.49k | £37.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED ON 22ND MAY 1999 AND 4TH JUNE 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DALTON TOWN OF DALTON-IN-FURNESS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OTHER POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
DALTON-IN-FURNESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dalton Community Association
21 Nelson Street
DALTON-IN-FURNESS
LA15 8AF
- Phone:
- 01229463929
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window