JOHN LYALL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the UK we are focussed on raising money to fund educational work with street children in the Philippines. This includes assisting in formal and informal educational opportunities, facilitated through the appointment of our project manager in the Philippines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Philippines
Governance
- 28 March 2000: Standard registration
- 07 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JLT (Working name)
- JOHN LYALL TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.20k | £27.24k | £6.35k | £14.62k | £4.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.97k | £32.76k | £15.03k | £14.12k | £19.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 22 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 12 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 1999, AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2000 AND 30 OCTOBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(A) THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF LIBIS, BINAGONAN, RIZAL, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FORGOING WAWA IN THE PHILIPPINES (THE AREA OF BENEFIT). (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN. (C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MIGHT BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
PHILIPPINES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window