LANDMINE DISABILITY SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief and rehabilitation of victims of landmines in any part of the world and in particular in Cambodia by any charitable means including, but without limitation, the provision of vocational training and education and any other services relevent to the needs of such disabled persons and their families and carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Oxfordshire
- Cambodia
Governance
- 25 June 1999: Standard registration
- 07 November 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CWARS INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350 | £13.75k | £525 | £1.55k | £25 | |
|
Total expenditure | £914 | £60 | £2.36k | £7.38k | £6.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF VICTIMS OF LANDMINES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR IN CAMBODIA BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND EDUCATION AND ANY OTHER SERVICES RELEVANT TO THE NEEDS OF SUCH DISABLED PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window