THE CENTRE FOR SPECIALIST EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity operating a wide range of community based ethnically sensitive programmes to promote educational provision, advocacy, quality of life, teenage and family support empowerment and community voluntary sector provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £62,938 from 1 government contract(s) and £13,820 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARNOLD HENRY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
Isaac Luftig | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.20k | £94.31k | £69.19k | £76.60k | £86.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.10k | £108.52k | £51.71k | £95.39k | £82.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £40.36k | £40.36k | £55.36k | £41.82k | £62.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.48k | £13.30k | £2.98k | £18.68k | £13.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JUNE 2000, 29 JUNE 2000 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF JEWISH CHILDREN. II. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON CHARITABLE BODIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES. III. THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY RESOURCE LIBRARY TO BE USED BY THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND FACILITATING PARTNERSHIP AND CO-OPERATION IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR. IV. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
115
Leicester Road
SALFORD
LANCS
M7 4GP
- Phone:
- 01617208585
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window