HUMANITARIAN AID TO NEW DELHI SLUMS (H.A.N.D.S.)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of services such as health awareness, sanitation, education and training to slum communities. General HIV/Aids awareness. Support of orphans and widows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 01 October 1999: Standard registration
- 02 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- H.A.N.D.S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 20 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE PHYSICAL AND HUMANITARIAN NEEDS IF IMPOVERISHED COMMUNITIES IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD. THE PRIMARY FOCUS IS THE SLUM COMMUNITIES OF NEW DELHI, INDIA
Area of benefit
INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window