Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE PHILHARMONIC CHOIR
Charity Number: 1078407
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 14 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 02 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 17 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 03 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 04 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 04 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 08 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 08 March 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window