Trustees BEREFT
Charity number: 1077140

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucas John Dawe | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Stinton | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Brian Derbyshire | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Langley-Jones | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elks | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Scott | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacek Henryk Opienski | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre McLellan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALEEN GALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Wickenden | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.