NEWS TALK LAMBETH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide news worthy items - local news, poems, international news and local events recorded on tape and sent free of charge to clients' home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 04 February 2000: Standard registration
- 16 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2004 | 01/01/2005 | 01/01/2006 | 01/01/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42k | £6.43k | £4.41k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £3.82k | £2.02k | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2007 | 03 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2006 | 21 November 2006 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2005 | 15 November 2006 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2004 | 16 November 2004 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND THOSE WHO, BY REASON OF ANY INCAPACITY, WHETHER TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT, HAVE DIFFICULTY IN READING AND WHO IN ALL CASES RESIDE IN, OR LIVE IN THE VICINITY OF, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES OR OTHER AVAILABLE MEDIA AND THE EQUIPMENT, IF NECESSARY, REQUIRED TO LISTEN TO SUCH TAPES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH AND THE VICINITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window