Financial history Friends of All Saints Primary School and Nursery, Stibbard

Charity Number: 1076272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.48k £524 £2.59k £4.50k £6.21k
Total expenditure £3.40k £2.73k £2.86k £4.02k £6.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A