Financial history PLYMOUTH CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1076364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £509.61k £531.18k £557.47k £544.12k £576.75k
Total expenditure £276.36k £330.76k £387.24k £567.56k £695.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £492.37k £509.28k £532.34k £508.37k £527.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.72k £21.90k £25.14k £35.75k £49.75k
Income - Other £0 £531.18k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £276.36k £330.76k £387.24k £567.56k £695.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £330.76k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0