Trustees PLYMOUTH CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1076364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Hole Chair
None on record
Toby Gourlay Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Jack Mark Addison Lewis Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
David Marks Trustee 13 May 2020
None on record
Ronald Brown Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
James Lewis Trustee 21 October 2013
None on record
Paul Northmore Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record