LINCOLN TOY LIBRARY AND WORKSHOP COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have a loaning library which has approx. 1000 toys and games for hire, including a selection particularly suitable for children with special needs. We also have a soft play area which provides a safe and stimulating environment for children aged 5 years and under.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 August 1999: Standard registration
- 15 July 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 July 2015: Funds transferred to 1071058 CHILDREN'S LINKS
- LINCOLN TOY LIBRARY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.79k | £45.83k | £42.01k | £36.60k | £30.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.76k | £39.13k | £30.79k | £37.37k | £38.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 16 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 16 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 23 November 2013 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 15 November 2013 | 15 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 31 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 13 November 2012 | 13 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF LOCAL CHILDREN PARTICULARLY THOSE HAVING SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 1 OF THE EDUCATION ACT 1981, BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window