Financial history 1ST ALDRIDGE 36TH WALSALL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1076389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.95k £15.96k £10.19k £24.84k £24.83k
Total expenditure £5.33k £23.19k £14.19k £16.16k £22.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.67k N/A N/A N/A