Accounts and annual returns BOSTON MAYFLOWER LIMITED

Charity number: 1078179
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 09 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 03 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 11 December 2014 On Time