Financial history BOSTON MAYFLOWER LIMITED

Charity number: 1078179
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £19.82m £20.49m £20.57m £21.00m £21.20m
Total expenditure £16.29m £16.79m £14.76m £16.15m £15.99m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £162.00k £0 £258.52k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £297.83k £0
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £19.82m £20.49m £20.57m £21.00m £21.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.27m £16.76m £14.76m £16.15m £15.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £26.00k £31.27k £31.13k £36.00k £37.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.98k £10.00k £9.59k £7.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0