BREDE STEAM ENGINE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the subject of steam pumping engines used in the water industry and in related subjects with particular reference to the Brede Steam Pumping Engines and the Brede Tramway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 September 2000: Standard registration
- BREDE STEAM ENGINE SOCIETY (Working name)
- BSES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Moody | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Atkinson | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Wood | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Beaney | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Moore | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY ATKINSON | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Dadswell | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.15k | £2.18k | £95.93k | £8.75k | £114.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.97k | £4.53k | £9.49k | £35.54k | £33.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 20 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF STEAM PUMPING ENGINES USED IN THE WATER INDUSTRY AND IN RELATED SUBJECTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BREDE STEAM PUMPING ENGINES AND THE BREDE TRAMWAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brede Steam Engine Society
Waterworks Lane
Brede
Rye
East Sussex
TN31 6HG
- Phone:
- 01424 844882
- Email:
- bredesteamgiants@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window