THE CIECHANOWIECKI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enrich the collection of works of art and memorabilia at the Museum of the Royal Castle in Warsaw.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Poland
Governance
- 23 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrej Rottermund | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Zamoyski | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER J M SCOTT | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERESA MROZEK-FOLKIERSKA | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
COUNT MICHAEL BADENI | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
COUNTESS KATARZYNA RACZYNSKA | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.79k | £29.16k | £27.06k | £34.96k | £41.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £565.25k | £65.08k | £172.31k | £76.03k | £111.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AND THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS THE FURTHERANCE OF AESTHETIC EDUCATION IN POLAND AND IN PARTICULAR AT THE ROYAL CASTLE IN WARSAW :- (A) TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES PARTICULARLY FOR THE HANDICAPPED (B) TO FACILITATE THE PUBLICATION OF BOOKS AND ACADEMIC WORKS (C) TO PROVIDE BURSARIES AND OTHER AWARDS TO SUCH ACADEMIC STAFF OF THE MUSEUM OF ROYAL CASTLE IN WARSAW AS SHALL BE CHOSEN BY THE DIRECTORS THEREOF OR OTHER OFFICERS FOR THE TIME BEING WHO SHALL BE IN CHARGE OF THE MUSEUM (D) TO ENRICH THE COLLECTION OF WORKS OF ART AND MEMORABILIA AT THE MUSEUM (E) TO CONSERVE AND PRESERVE WORKS OF ART AT THE MUSEUM PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
POLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cripps Pemberton Greenish
Number 22
Mount Ephraim
Tunbridge Wells
Kent
Tn48as
- Phone:
- 07755864462
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window