Financial history FRIENDS OF THE TIBSHELF TOWN END JUNIOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1076192
Charity reporting is overdue by 1402 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £5.38k £6.77k £5.85k £4.27k £1.94k
Total expenditure £4.56k £4.61k £9.74k £2.07k £1.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A