Financial history THE CLARKE LISTER BRAIN HAEMORRHAGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079845
Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £13.19k £17.45k £11.91k £17.62k £5.26k
Total expenditure £17.59k £17.88k £18.29k £16.57k £628
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A