Accounts and annual returns DONISTHORPE HALL

Charity number: 1077573
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 June 2024
Accounts and TAR 29 June 2024
Annual return 29 June 2023
Accounts and TAR 29 June 2023
Annual return 29 June 2022
Accounts and TAR 29 June 2022
Annual return 29 June 2021
Accounts and TAR 29 June 2021
Annual return 29 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1470 days
Accounts and TAR 29 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1470 days