Financial history DISTRICT C.E. PRIMARY (MERSEYSIDE) P.T.F.A

Charity number: 1077023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £899 £3.49k £5.49k £6.39k £4.90k
Total expenditure £883 £1.71k £3.38k £4.52k £2.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A