SAVE A CHILD'S HEART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funds for medical care and treatment for children from developing countries. To provide funds for the training of medical personnel from developing countries for the benefit of such children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WALTER FELMAN | Chair | 26 April 1999 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jayne Franks | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Phillipa Cohen | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shier Aviv Ziser Dawood | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Silverston | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.84k | £205.11k | £493.80k | £204.24k | £155.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.67k | £197.77k | £474.32k | £153.32k | £191.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 2ND AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE MEDICAL CARE AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN FROM DEVELOPING COUNTRIES WHO NEED AND MIGHT OTHERWISE NOT RECEIVE SUCH CARE AND TREATMENT AND FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH TO BENEFIT SUCH CHILDREN (2) TO PROVIDE FUNDS DIRECTED TO THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN MEDICINE AND MEDICAL RESEARCH OF PERSONS FROM DEVELOPING COUNTRIES IN THEIR OWN COUNTRY AND/OR ELSEWHERE FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN (3) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN MEDICINE AND MEDICAL RESEARCH OF PERSONS FROM DEVELOPING COUNTRIES IN THEIR OWN COUNTRY OR ELSEWHERE IN ORDER TO ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP THESE SKILLS WHICH MAY ASSIST THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WELL BEING IN ALL RESPECTS AND THOSE OF THEIR COMPATRIOTS AND OTHERS
Area of benefit
DEVELOPING COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Crown Walk
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP3 9WS
- Phone:
- 01442234255
- Email:
- hello@saveachildsheart.com
- Website:
-
saveachildsheart.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window